CT SB00994 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the Department of Motor Vehicles regarding the application for a commercial driver's license or commercial driver's instruction permit, the elimination of the limited repairer's license, the renewal of a license to conduct a drivers' school, child restraint systems and the improper use of a number plate or operator's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Department Of Motor Vehicles, Studying An Emergency Contact Information Database Or Revisions To Motor Vehicle Records And Concerning The Safety Driving Course, Motor Vehicle Dealers And Repairers, Motor Vehicle Safety Recalls, The Knowledge Test For An Operator's License, Reciprocal Recognition Of Driver Training Requirements, Trespass On Watershed Land, Emergency Lights, Removable Windshield Placards, School Buses, Registration Certificates And Minor Revisions To Motor Vehicle Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2023-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2023-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2023-06-05SenatePublic Act 23-40
2023-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2023-06-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-06-01HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 605
2023-05-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-05-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8599
2023-04-20SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-04-20SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2023-04-20SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-19SenateJoint Favorable
2023-04-12SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-29SenateFile Number 293
2023-03-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 189
2023-03-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-03-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-02-10SenatePublic Hearing 02/15
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00994&which_year=2023
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00994-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00994-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00994-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/ACT/PA/PDF/2023PA-00040-R00SB-00994-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/S/pdf/2023SB-00994-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-00994-R000293-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-00994-R000293-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00994-R00LCO08599-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-00994-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-00994-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/SUM/PDF/2023SUM00040-R02SB-00994-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-00994-R00TRA-CV53-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-00994-R00JUD-CV124-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/S/PDF/2023SV-00250-R00SB00994-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/H/PDF/2023HV-00222-R00SB00994-HV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback