CT SB00993 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To remove the property tax exemption for solar projects under seven megawatts and reclassify the tax calculation of solar projects on single parcels of land.
Title
An Act Assessing An Annual Fee Against Certain Class I Renewable Energy Source Installations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 292 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 183 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |