CT SB00991 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 534
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a right to legal representation in immigration removal proceedings at the federal Executive Office for Immigration Review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Access To Legal Counsel For Children In Immigration Removal Proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 534
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 243
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-04SenatePublic Hearing 03/08
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback