CT SB00990 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To discourage employers from closing call centers in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Call Centers And Notice Of Closure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 11 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateMotion Failed (JF)
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 533
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 256
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback