CT SB00989 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To combat online harassment, including that motivated by hate, by (1) extending the crime of stalking in the first degree to specifically include certain hate-based motivations, (2) extending the crime of second-degree stalking to include certain electronic disclosures of personal identifiable information without consent and establishing a civil action for victims of such crime, and (3) extending the crime of second-degree harassment to include more electronic forms of communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Online Harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 237 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 217 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-06-10SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-10SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-09SenatePublic Act 21-56
2021-06-03SenateIn Concurrence
2021-06-03SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-03SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-21SenateHouse Calendar Number 537
2021-05-21SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-05-20SenateOn Consent Calendar
2021-05-20SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-20SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8244
2021-04-26SenateFile Number 612
2021-04-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 351
2021-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-09SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-05SenatePublic Hearing 03/10
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00989&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-00989-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-00989-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00056-R00SB-00989-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08244-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-00989-R000612-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-00989-R000612-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-00989-R00LCO08244-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-00989-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-00989-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/SUM/PDF/2021SUM00056-R02SB-00989-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/S/PDF/2021SB-00989-R00JUD-CV116-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00217-R00SB00989-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00237-R00SB00989-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00279-R00SB00989-HV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback