CT SB00989 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide basic labor standards for transportation network company drivers.
Title
An Act Concerning Basic Labor Standards For Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Motion Failed (JF) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 457 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 223 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |