CT SB00988 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect the public by ensuring that workers who perform natural gas delivery work are properly trained and certified.
Title
An Act Concerning The Workforce And The Safe Delivery Of Natural Gas Distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 379 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 203 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |