CT SB00984 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to conduct a study to evaluate the efficacy of the programs administered by the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | File Number 194 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 156 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |