CT SB00980 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To eliminate income and asset limits for working persons with disabilities to qualify for Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Eliminating Income And Asset Limits For The Med-connect Program For Persons With Disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-19SenateFile Number 517
2021-04-19SenateSenate Calendar Number 311
2021-04-19SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-31SenateJoint Favorable
2021-03-04SenatePublic Hearing 03/11
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback