CT SB00977 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to develop uniform standards for the provision of virtual learning in public schools, conduct a comprehensive audit of virtual learning programs in the state and develop guidelines for training educators in the provision of virtual learning.
Title
An Act Concerning Virtual Learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |