CT SB00975 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To affirm that residents of long-term care facilities have the right to treat their living quarters as their homes and have the same rights as all other state residents, including the right to use technology of their choice for purposes, including, but not limited to, virtual visitation and file grievances for violations of their rights.
Title
An Act Strengthening The Bills Of Rights For Long-term Care Residents And Authorizing The Use Of Resident Technology For Virtual Visitation And Virtual Monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 272 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 21-55 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 505 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8481 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | File Number 193 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 155 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |