CT SB00972 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide cost-free telecommunications for incarcerated persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Communication Services In Correctional And Juvenile Detention Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 AS AMENDED (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 288 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 288 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 21-54 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 9262 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 535 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8981 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8978 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 453 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 269 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |