CT SB00972 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To grant access to original birth records to all adopted persons eighteen years of age or older who were born in Connecticut regardless of date of birth.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Original Birth Certificates By Adult Adopted Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 244 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 9854 (Y: 9 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 245 PASS (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 245 PASS (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Calendar Number 687 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9854 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 9854 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | File Number 597 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 293 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |