CT SB00971 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - House Calendar Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - House Calendar Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow for moneys held in Climate Change and Coastal Resiliency Reserve Funds created by municipalities to be invested in trust funds administered, held or invested by the treasurer.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Treasurer And Climate Change And Coastal Resiliency Reserve Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 303 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 585 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | File Number 559 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 325 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |