CT SB00968 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Military to Machinists job training program within the Labor Department for veterans.
Title
An Act Establishing The Military To Machinists And Veterans Platform To Employment Pilot Programs And Providing Other Employment Assistance To Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 360 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-129 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-03 | House | House Calendar Number 719 |
2019-06-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8681 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 7246 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 234 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 137 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |