CT SB00957 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To include computer science instruction in the public school curriculum, programs of teacher preparation and in-service training programs for teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Computer Science Instruction In Public Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 352 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 274 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-128
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 696
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10260
2019-05-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-21SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 595
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 284
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback