CT SB00957 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow types of financial assistance in addition to grants to be awarded from the Regenerative Medicine Research Fund and to replace the Regenerative Medicine Research Peer Review Committee with an independent panel of professional peer reviewers chosen by the Regenerative Medicine Research Advisory Committee.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Regenerative Medicine Research Fund And The Connecticut Bioscience Innovation Fund, And The Consolidation Of Certain Funds Of Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 304 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-222 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 665 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7616 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-25 | Senate | File Number 212 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 171 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |