CT SB00955 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the State Board of Education to appoint a district improvement officer to implement an improvement plan for a low achieving school or educational reform district.
Title
An Act Concerning State Assistance To Certain Underperforming School Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | Senate | File Number 566 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 301 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |