CT SB00937 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a student loan forgiveness program for early childhood educators.
Title
An Act Concerning A Student Loan Forgiveness Program For Early Childhood Educators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |