CT SB00936 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Office of Early Childhood.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Office Of Early Childhood.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 338 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 295 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 295 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 19-121 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 707 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9948 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 325 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 151 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |