CT SB00935 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Office of Early Childhood to develop an early childhood educator compensation schedule and for early childhood program providers to implement such compensation schedule.
Title
An Act Requiring The Office Of Early Childhood To Develop A Proposed Early Childhood Educator Compensation Schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 317 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 100 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 100 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Public Act 19-61 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 544 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7783 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 324 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 150 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |