CT SB00934 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require each local and regional board of education to list on such board's Internet web site the mental and emotional health resources available to students.
Title
An Act Requiring The Provision Of Information Concerning Mental And Emotional Health Resources By School Districts.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Mary Welander [D] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] |
Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | File Number 189 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 151 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |