CT SB00934 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To expand eligibility in the Care4Kids program to parents who are enrolled in school, in addition to high school, and require advance notice of expanded program eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding Eligibility In The Care4kids Program To Parents Enrolled In Other Types Of School.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-20SenateFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-20SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback