CT SB00934 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - File Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) restrict money in state parties' federal accounts from being used on state races, (2) permit gubernatorial candidates participating in the Citizens' Election Program to raise additional funds and qualify for supplemental grants under the program, (3) eliminate grants from the Citizens' Election Fund for candidates without an opponent, (4) permit members of the State Elections Enforcement Commission to serve more than two consecutive terms, (5) maintain consistent annual funding of the Program even if the Fund is overdrawn, (6) require increased disclosure with regard to campaign consultants, (7) adjust the lottery process by which districts are randomly selected for audit, and (8) make technical changes.
Title
An Act Restoring The Citizens' Election Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | File Number 614 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 312 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |