CT SB00934 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To waive extension fees for wartime veterans and active members of the Connecticut National Guard who attend an educational extension program or summer session at a regional community-technical college, the Connecticut State University System or The University of Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Fee Waivers For Educational Extension Programs And Summer School Sessions For Wartime Veterans And Members Of The Connecticut National Guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |