CT SB00932 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan Authority to establish the Alliance District Teacher Loan Subsidy Program to provide low interest student loans to teachers who are employed in alliance districts.
Title
An Act Concerning An Alliance District Teacher Loan Subsidy Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 289 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 191 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |