CT SB00929 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make the enforcement of striped bass fishing regulations more effective.
Title
An Act Concerning Penalties For The Taking Of Striped Bass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 343 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Public Act 21-124 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-06-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 594 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | File Number 534 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 314 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |