CT SB00925 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To adopt and confirm the general statutes, revised to January 1, 2023.
Title
An Act Confirming And Adopting Volumes 1 To 13, Inclusive, Of The General Statutes Revised To January 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 228 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 23-107 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-01 | House | House Passed |
2023-05-18 | House | House Calendar Number 535 |
2023-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-16 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | File Number 598 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 352 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |