CT SB00925 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the import and trade of any big six African species.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Import, Sale And Possession Of African Elephants, Lions, Leopards, Black Rhinoceros, White Rhinoceros And Giraffes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 SENATE AMD B (Y: 76 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 209 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 SENATE AMD B (Y: 76 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 209 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | House | Public Act 21-52 |
2021-06-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2021-06-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8895 |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules Suspended |
2021-06-03 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-02 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9812 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 532 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8888 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 8306 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | File Number 637 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 5:00 PM |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | Senate | File Number 216 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 164 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |