CT SB00923 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - House Calendar Number 447
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - House Calendar Number 447
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Connecticut Sentencing Commission to review the animal cruelty laws in this state and other states and make recommendations, if any, to the legislature for changes to state laws.
Title
An Act Concerning Review Of Animal Cruelty Laws By The Connecticut Sentencing Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 447 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | File Number 424 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 255 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |