CT SB00920 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the requirements regarding the utilization of public-private partnerships to design, develop, finance, construct, operate or maintain projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Public-private Partnerships.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 AS AMENDED (Y: 107 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 220 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 221 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 220 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 221 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 21-99 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 531 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7562 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9004 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-13 | Senate | File Number 423 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 261 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |