CT SB00904 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To specify the executive director of the Labor Department's Employment Security Division shall be in the classified service and shall be devoted full-time to the duties of his or her office.
Title
An Act Concerning The Executive Director Of The Labor Department's Employment Security Division And Increasing The Compensation For State Board Of Mediation And Arbitration Members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 297 AS AMENDED (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 150 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 151 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 150 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 151 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 21-98 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 496 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8455 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | File Number 401 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 245 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |