CT SB00904 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Revenue Services to establish a first-time homebuyer savings account program and establish a tax deduction for contributions to first-time homebuyer savings accounts.
Title
An Act Requiring The Commissioner Of Revenue Services To Establish A First-time Homebuyer Savings Account Program And Establishing A Tax Deduction For Contributions To First-time Homebuyer Savings Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 321 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 168 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |