CT SB00903 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 320
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To revise the standards governing (1) insurance data and information security, (2) notices following cybersecurity events, and (3) investigations of cybersecurity events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Insurance Data And Information Security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 320
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 167
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback