CT SB00903 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To strengthen and clarify academic qualifications for licensed professional counselors and require licensed professional counselors to complete continuing education in professional ethics.
Title
An Act Concerning Educational And Professional Standards For Professional Counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 360 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Public Act 17-94 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 641 |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8232 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | File Number 474 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 250 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |