CT SB00903 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the membership of the Commission of Pharmacy from six to seven members, and to specify that one of the pharmacist members shall be from an independent retail setting and another from a chain retail setting.
Title
An Act Increasing The Membership Of The Commission Of Pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 277 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 277 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Public Act 13-86 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 582 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law |
2013-04-11 | Senate | File Number 439 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 310 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |