CT SB00901 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health concerning the adoption of a model food code.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendation Regarding Adoption Of A Model Food Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 358 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 284 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 284 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Public Act 17-93 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 640 |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8243 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6260 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | File Number 473 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 249 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |