CT SB00899 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To add senior centers and other facilities serving or housing senior citizens to those notified of sex offenders in their neighborhoods and provide education to senior citizens on how to protect themselves from the threat of sex offenders.
Title
An Act Concerning Senior Safety Zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | File Number 187 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 149 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |