CT SB00894 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by Governor in Original
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by Governor in Original
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the manufacture, sale and distribution of alcohol-infused confections, including, but not limited to, chocolate.
Title
An Act Concerning The Manufacture, Sale And Distribution Of Alcohol-infused Confections, The Authorization Of Self-pour Automated Systems For Certain Alcoholic Liquor, A Study Of Extending Alcoholic Liquor Service Hours And Backers Of Grocery Store Beer Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 SENATE AMD A (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 292 AS AMENDED (Y: 119 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 292 AS AMENDED (Y: 119 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 21-50 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 494 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8319 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | File Number 113 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 122 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |