CT SB00893 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To enable the growth of the state's industrial hemp industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Pilot Program For Hemp Production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 89 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 85 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-05-14SenatePublic Act 19-3
2019-05-09SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2019-05-08SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2019-05-08SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-08SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-08SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-07SenateTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-07SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-07SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-07SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-07SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-06SenateReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 515
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7541
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 230
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 120
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 03/01
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback