CT SB00893 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the time long-term care facilities have to file cost reports with the state.
Title
An Act Extending Cost Reporting Deadlines For Long-term Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 186 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Public Act 15-36 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 557 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | File Number 66 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 103 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |