CT SB00891 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To make the Ezequiel Santiago Foreclosure Mediation Program permanent and to require that certain alternatives to foreclosure be made available to certain mortgagors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Ezequiel Santiago Foreclosure Mediation Program And Other Alternatives To Foreclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 140 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-06-08SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-08SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-07SenatePublic Act 21-44
2021-06-02SenateIn Concurrence
2021-06-02SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-02SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-14SenateHouse Calendar Number 493
2021-05-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-05-12SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-12SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8441
2021-04-01SenateFile Number 248
2021-04-01SenateSenate Calendar Number 173
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-04-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM
2021-03-17SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-17SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-02-26SenatePublic Hearing 03/02
2021-02-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00891&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-00891-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-00891-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00044-R00SB-00891-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO07203-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08171-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08418-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-00891-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-00891-R000248-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-00891-R000248-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-00891-R00LCO07203-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-00891-R00LCO08171-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-00891-R00LCO08418-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-00891-R00LCO08441-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-00891-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-00891-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/SUM/PDF/2021SUM00044-R02SB-00891-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/S/PDF/2021SB-00891-R00BA-CV39-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00141-R00SB00891-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00140-R00SB00891-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00261-R00SB00891-HV.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback