CT SB00891 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reorganize statutes related to the failure to report suspected child abuse and neglect.
Title
An Act Concerning The Failure To Report Suspected Child Abuse Or Neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | File Number 136 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 87 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |