CT SB00888 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Responsibly And Equitably Regulating Adult-use Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-22 | Senate | File Number 569 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 341 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |