CT SB00886 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal a duplicate provision in the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Payment Of Mortgage Loan Proceeds By Wire Transfer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |