CT SB00884 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - File Number 533
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - File Number 533
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Reducing Transportation-related Carbon Emissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | File Number 533 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 313 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |