CT SB00881 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 525
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Paid Family And Medical Leave Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 525
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 255
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback