CT SB00858 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage of medical advice, diagnosis, care or treatment provided through telemedicine if such advice, diagnosis, care or treatment is covered when provided through in-person consultation.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Telemedicine Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 95 PASS (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 379 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | File Number 32 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 93 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/13 10:00 AM |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |