CT SB00857 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - File Number 340
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - File Number 340
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To regulate the imposition of certain prescription drug utilization requirements on insureds.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Step Therapy For And Off-label Prescribing Of Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | File Number 340 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 256 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |