CT SB00855 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 370
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 370
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the position of Secretary of Manufacturing.
Title
An Act Establishing The Position Of Director Of Manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 370 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 180 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |